IL HB2086 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Provides that the month of April of each year is designated as Healthy Pet Month to be observed throughout the State as a month in which all Illinois pet owners are encouraged to take time to review their pet's health needs and make arrangements with their veterinarians to have annual exams and evaluations performed to enhance and extend their pet's quality of life.
Title
HEALTHY PET MONTH
Sponsors
Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0244 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 005-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant |