IL HB2045 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0086
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0086
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that neither the Department of Corrections nor the Department of Juvenile Justice may require a committed person or person committed to any facility operated by the Department of Juvenile Justice to pay any co-payment for receiving medical or dental services.
Title
CD CORR-CO PAYMENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0086 |
2019-07-19 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 045-012-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-003-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-07 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-6-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |