IL HB1955 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-06 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 106 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0362
2017-08-25HouseEffective Date August 25, 2017
2017-08-25HouseGovernor Approved
2017-08-04HouseSent to the Governor
2017-07-06HousePassed Both Houses
2017-07-06HouseHouse Concurs
2017-07-06House3/5 Vote Required
2017-07-06HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 106-005-000
2017-07-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-07-06HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-07-04HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-07-04HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-07-04HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-07-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-07-04HouseArrived in House
2017-07-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-07-04Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-07-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-07-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Althoff
2017-07-04SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-07-04SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As July 4, 2017
2017-07-01SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As July 1, 2017
2017-06-30SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As June 30, 2017
2017-06-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 006-000-000
2017-06-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-06-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2017-06-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-06-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-30SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-05-30SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-19SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-16SenatePostponed - Insurance
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Insurance
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-04-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-000-000
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 003-000-000
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
2017-04-21HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-04-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ***
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21551Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1955&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1955.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1955eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1955enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0362.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1955ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1955ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1955sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB1955_04282017_069000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB1955_07042017_008000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB1955_07062017_005000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback