IL HB1785 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0360
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0360
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Vital Records Act. Defines "intersex condition", "licensed health care professional", and "licensed mental health professional". Changes provisions concerning the issuance of new birth certificates for individuals that have undergone gender transition treatment. Provides that in order to change an individual's sex designation on the individual's birth certificate, a licensed health care professional or licensed mental health professional must make a declaration concerning the treatment. Requires that the licensed health care professional or licensed mental health professional sign and date a specified statement. Provides that newly issued birth certificates may reflect a name change if the documents for a name change are submitted. Changes a reference from "sex change" to "change of sex designation". Provides that following the issuance of a new birth certificate, the individual may request the original certificate and evidence of adoption, paternity, legitimation, or change of sex designation for inspection or certification purposes. Makes corresponding changes.
Title
BIRTH CERT-SEX DESIGNATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 43 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 43 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0360 |
2017-08-25 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 032-022-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 005-003-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 063-043-001 |
2017-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-05-18 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-03-24 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-03-24 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-03-24 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2017-03-24 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2017-03-24 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2017-03-23 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2017-03-23 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2017-03-23 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2017-03-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-03-23 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-03-23 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-03-23 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-03-23 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-03-23 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-03-23 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-03-23 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2017-03-22 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2017-03-22 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-03-22 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-03-22 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Human Services Committee; 007-004-000 |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 535 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 535 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |