IL HB1719 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code, the Seizure Smart School Act, the College and Career Success for All Students Act, the Juvenile Court Act of 1987, the Sex Offender Community Notification Law, and the Murderer and Violent Offender Against Youth Registration Act to replace the terms "school guidance counselor" and "guidance counselor" with the term "school counselor". Effective July 1, 2021.
Title
SCH CD-SCHOOL COUNSELOR
Sponsors
Rep. Deanne Mazzochi [R] | Rep. Christopher Davidsmeyer [R] | Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] |
Sen. John Curran [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0197 |
2021-07-30 | House | Effective Date July 30, 2021 |
2021-07-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2021 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 150 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 302 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-22.39 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-27.1A | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 18-8.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 22-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-23.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 1-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 152 | 121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 154 | 100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |