IL HB1710 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0196
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0196
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Rehabilitation of Persons with Disabilities Act. Requires the Superintendent of the Illinois School for the Deaf to have a degree in educational administration, together with at least 10 years of experience in either deaf or hard of hearing education, the administration of deaf or hard of hearing education, or a combination of the 2 (rather than degrees in both educational administration and deaf education, together with at least 15 years of experience in either deaf education, the administration of deaf education, or a combination of the 2). Requires the Superintendent of the Illinois School of the Visually Impaired to have a degree in educational administration, together with at least 10 years of experience in either blind or visually impaired education, or a combination of the 2 (rather than degrees in both educational administration and blind and visually impaired education, the administration of blind or visually impaired education, or a combination of the 2). Effective immediately.
Title
SCH DEAF/BLIND-SUPERINTENDENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0196 |
2021-07-30 | House | Effective Date July 30, 2021 |
2021-07-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2021 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2405 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |