IL HB1710 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Pam Roth [R] | Rep. John Cabello [R] | Sen. Susan Rezin [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0231 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2013 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 011-000-000 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-001-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Public Safety: Police & Fire Committee; 018-000-000 |
2013-03-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Safety: Police & Fire Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Pam Roth |
2013-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Pam Roth |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 1-1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |