IL HB1682 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0228
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0228
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
FINANCE-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0228 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2013 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000 |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2013-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 018-000-000 |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2013-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2013-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay |
2013-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-04-08 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dwight Kay |
2013-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |