IL HB1659 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the River Conservancy Districts Act. Provides for competitive bidding for all contracts for work, other than professional services, to be done by a conservancy district when the expense of the contract will exceed $10,000 (rather than $2,500). Effective immediately.
Title
CONSERVANCY DIST-CONTRACT BIDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0241 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-001-000 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-038-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-002-000 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 2105 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |