IL HB1653 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-12 - Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-12 - Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hospital Services Trust Fund Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to establish a health care transformation program that shall be supported by the transformation funding pool. Provides that it is the intention of the General Assembly that innovative partnerships funded by the pool must be designed to establish or improve integrated health care delivery systems that will provide significant access to the Medicaid and uninsured populations in their communities, as well as improve health care equity. Provides that during State fiscal years 2021 through 2027, the hospital and health care transformation program shall be supported by an annual transformation funding pool of up to $150,000,000, pending federal matching funds, to be allocated during the specified fiscal years for the purpose of facilitating hospital and health care transformation. Provides that funding agreements made in accordance with the transformation program shall be considered purchases of care under the Illinois Procurement Code and funds shall be expended by the Department in a manner that maximizes federal funding to expend the entire allocated amount. Contains provisions concerning the criteria for transformation proposals; entities eligible for funding under the transformation program; the process for submitting transformation projects; the Department's process for evaluating and approving transformation proposals; and other matters. Effective immediately.
Title
ANTI-WAGE THEFT-STATE CONTRACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-01-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-001-000 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Steans |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Omar Aquino |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 11, 2021 |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021 |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 10, 2021 |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 069-043-000 |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-04-04 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-008-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-02-14 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 50-14.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 50-60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 115 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |