IL HB1652 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0240
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0240
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of House Amendment No. 1 with changes. Modifies the additional responsibilities of the military liaison to include virtual, phone, or in-person periodic meetings with each military installation military and family support center. Provides for expedited occupational or professional licenses (rather than temporary occupational or professional licenses). Removes provisions requiring a service member or his or her spouse to present military orders as evidence of residence in order to receive a temporary expedited license. Restores provisions requiring a service member or his or her spouse to include proof of an application for full licensure as a part of his or her expedited license application. Strikes a provision concerning the duration of a temporary expedited license issued to a service member or his or her spouse. Modifies provisions concerning the reactivation (rather than renewal) of a license by a service member or his or her spouse. Makes other changes.
Title
SERVICE MEMBER-EXPEDITED LIC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0240 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000 |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000 |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 007-000-000 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-04-01 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-04-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 5 | 5-715 | Amended Code | Citation Text |