IL HB1646 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-30 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-30 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Funeral Directors and Embalmers Licensing Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning legislative intent.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2016 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-001-001 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. David Koehler |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 23, 2015 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2015-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2015-04-20 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 |
2015-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2015-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2015-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2015-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2015-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2015-04-14 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2015-04-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-27 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015 |
2015-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2015-02-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 41 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |