IL HB1644 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-12 - Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-12 - Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that beginning 180 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, it is unlawful to possess, sell, offer for sale, trade, or distribute a pangolin product. Provides that unlawful possession or sale of pangolin products is a Class A misdemeanor. Defines "pangolin" and "pangolin product".
Title
CRIM CD-PANGOLIN PRODUCTS
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Pappas [D] | Sen. John Connor [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] |
Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-12 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-11-12 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-02-19 | House | To Sentencing, Penalities and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1644&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1644.htm |