IL HB1633 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-12)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Adds coal mines and any mining operation, including any processing equipment, batching operation, or support facility for that mining operation to the definition of "critical infrastructure facility". Provides that a business, corporation, or organization may be liable for conspiracy to commit criminal damage to a critical infrastructure facility, criminal trespass to a critical infrastructure facility, or aggravated criminal trespass to a critical infrastructure facility if the business, corporation, or organization intentionally sponsors, funds, or pays for an individual who causes substantial harm through the commission of any of those offenses. Provides that criminal damage to a critical infrastructure facility is a Class 3 felony (rather than a Class 1 felony). Provides exemptions. Makes other changes.
Title
CRIM CD-CRITICAL INFRASTRUCTUR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 28 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Tabled by Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 002-001-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Postponed-Criminal Law |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Postponed-Criminal Law |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-05-02 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 077-028-003 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-003-000 |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-006-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-01-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-01-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-01-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 2-5.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 5 | 21-1.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 5 | 21-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 8-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |