IL HB1604 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on December 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0615
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on December 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0615
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the definition of "33 1/3%".
Title
REVENUE-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Sullivan [R] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] |
Rep. Barbara Currie [D] | Sen. Terry Link [D] | Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-11-07 - Senate - Amendment in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0615 |
2013-12-30 | House | Effective Date June 1, 2014 |
2013-12-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-11-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-11-07 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Recedes 057-000-000 |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Recede Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Recede Referred to Assignments |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Recede Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 - November 7, 2013 |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2013-05-30 | House | House Non-Concurs |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Prevailed ; - Non-Concur |
2013-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2013-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2013-05-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2013 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2013-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2013-03-08 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 1-55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |