IL HB1565 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Departments of State Government Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that an office of Inspector General established within a department of State government, or otherwise established in any agency under the jurisdiction of the Governor, that is in existence on the effective date of this amendatory Act, or which may be established thereafter, shall be a fully independent office with its own appropriation separate from the overall appropriation for the department in which such office is established.
Title
INSPECTOR GENERAL-INDEP APPROP
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Steven Reick [R] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] |
Sen. Darren Bailey [R] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-04 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1565&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1565.htm |