IL HB1562 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Oil and Gas Act and the Hydraulic Fracturing Regulatory Act. Requires as part of the permit application for drilling or hydraulic fracturing operations the written consent of each owner of a mineral interest affected by the removal of minerals in the conduct of the proposed operations and each surface owner affected by the removal of minerals in the conduct of the proposed operations, unless he or she is the mineral interest owner and has provided consent as such. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of statutory or common law, a person shall not drill, conduct hydraulic fracturing operations, or remove minerals as a result of any means regulated by the Acts including, but not limited to, horizontal drilling, without the express, written consent of each owner of a mineral interest affected by the operations or removal of minerals in the conduct of the operations. Provides for enforcement by the Department of Natural Resources with penalties and cessation of operations for violations, and payment of treble the full market value of the mineral resource extracted in violation to the owner of the mineral interest.
Title
MINERAL RIGHTS - OIL AND GAS
Sponsors
Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Maurice West [D] |
Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Sen. John Connor [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Sen. Karina Villa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-02-27 | House | To Business and Industry Regulations Subcommittee |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 725 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 725 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 725 | 8e | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 732 | 1-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 732 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 732 | 1-90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1562&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1562.htm |