IL HB1499 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Local Cannabis Licensing Act. Provides that a county or municipality may issue licenses for temporary events, cannabis clubs, and cannabis tours that will allow for the sale and consumption of cannabis or cannabis-infused products and for the sale of cannabis paraphernalia at such temporary events, clubs, or tours. Allows tours of cannabis craft grower or cultivation center facilities. Requires ordinances with specified requirements for such temporary events, cannabis clubs, and cannabis tours before any licenses are issued. Limits home rule powers. Makes conforming changes in the Cannabis Regulation and Tax Act and Smoke Free Illinois Act. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL CANNABIS LICENSING ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 705 | 10-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 705 | 10-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 705 | 55-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 82 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1499&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1499.htm |