IL HB1460 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-4)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the Act may be referred to as the Knight-Silas Act. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that aggravated battery, other than by the discharge of a firearm, includes a battery committed by a person who, at the time of the commission of the offense, is 21 years of age or older and the battery was committed upon an individual whom the person committing the offense knows to be a person working under the Adult Protective Services Program or an Ombudsman under the State Long Term Care Ombudsman Program of the Department on Aging, or a Department of Children and Family Services employee: (1) performing his or her official duties; (2) battered to prevent performance of his or her official duties; or (3) battered in retaliation for performing his or her official duties. Provides that a violation is a Class 2 felony, except if the battery causes great bodily harm or permanent disability or disfigurement to an individual, a violation is a Class 1 felony. Defines "Department of Children and Family Services employee" and "ombudsman".
Title
THE KNIGHT-SILAS ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2024-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer |
2024-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2024-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha |
2024-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2023-03-02 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. John Egofske |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Egofske |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-3.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1460&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1460.htm |