IL HB1439 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Senior Citizens Real Estate Tax Deferral Act. Provides that the rate of interest for taxes deferred on or after the effective date is equal to the most recent yield on a 30-year treasury bond as of the date the taxes were deferred, but not to exceed 6% per year (currently, the rate is 6% per year). Effective immediately.
Title
SENIOR TAX DEFERRAL-INTEREST
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Esther Golar [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] |
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 30 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1439&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB1439.htm |