IL HB1388 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0214
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0214
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts by changing "podiatrist" to "podiatric physician". Also makes revisory changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PODIATRIC PHYSICIANS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0214 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2013 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 12, 2013 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |