IL HB1380 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Wrongful Prosecution Commission Act. Creates the Wrongful Prosecution Commission as an independent commission under the Illinois Human Rights Commission for administrative purposes. Defines "claim of wrongful prosecution" as a claim by or on behalf of a living person convicted of a crime in a county of more than 3,000,000 inhabitants asserting that the person was falsely incriminated for the crime and there is credible evidence related to allegations of the use of false evidence to obtain the conviction. Defines other terms. Provides that the Commission shall conduct inquiries into claims of wrongful prosecution. Provides that if the Commission concludes there is sufficient evidence of wrongful prosecution to merit judicial review, the Chair of the Commission shall request that the Chief Judge of the Circuit Court of Cook County assign the case to a trial judge for consideration. Provides that the Act applies to claims of wrongful prosecution filed not later than 5 years after the effective date of the Act. Repeals the Act 10 years after the effective date. Effective immediately.
Title
WRONGFUL PROSECUTION COMM'N
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1380&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1380.htm |