IL HB1379 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0213
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0213
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides an alternative procedure that a large public utility may choose in establishing the ratemaking rate base of a water or sewer utility that the large public utility is acquiring. Provides that the Commission's order that approves the large public utility's acquisition of the water or sewer utility shall include the Commission's decision establishing (1) the ratemaking rate base of the water or sewer utility and (2) the district or tariff group with which the water or sewer utility will be combined for ratemaking purposes. Sets forth provisions concerning definitions, appraisers and their duties, ratemaking rate base, and rate cases. Makes the provisions applicable until June 1, 2018. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
WATER & SEWER UTILITIES-VALUE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0213 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2013 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-002-000 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2013 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Energy; 012-000-000 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Energy |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 077-031-000 |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-04-18 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2013-03-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Meier |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 016-000-000 |
2013-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Public Utilities Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2013-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2013-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2013-02-20 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2013-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2013-02-20 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2013-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2013-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2013-02-19 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Adam Brown |
2013-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2013-02-19 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2013-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2013-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2013-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2013-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 9-210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 9-210.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |