IL HB1347 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Provides that subject to appropriation, a person is eligible for a diaper allowance of $30 per month per child if: the person's household income is at or below 50% of the federal poverty guidelines; the person is responsible for the welfare of a child 3 years of age or younger; and the child who is 3 years of age or younger receives medical assistance under the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the diaper allowance may be used only to purchase diapers and shall be issued through an electronic benefit transfer card. Provides that the diaper allowance is not considered income for purposes of determining eligibility or the amount of assistance for any public aid benefit provided under State law. Effective July 1, 2025.
Title
DHS-DIAPER ALLOWANCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2023-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2023-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2023-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2023-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2023-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2023-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2023-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2023-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2023-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-01-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-01-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-01-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins |