IL HB1327 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0210
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0210
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Patients' Right to Know Act. Extends the disclosure period from 5 years to 10 years for certain information that must be posted on a physician's public profile.
Title
PHYSICIAN PROFILES-DISCLOSURE
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] |
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Sen. William Delgado [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0210 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-03-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability and Accessibility Committee; 008-000-000 |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability and Accessibility Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 61 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |