IL HB1317 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Alternative Health Care Delivery Act. Makes a technical change in the Section concerning definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 007-005-000
2017-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-22HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-05-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-05-16HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-16HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
210310Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback