IL HB1315 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Eliminates the provision that possession by the defendant of more than one of the same film, videotape or visual reproduction or depiction by computer in which child pornography is depicted shall raise a rebuttable presumption that the defendant possessed such materials with the intent to disseminate them. Provides that possession of more than one of the same film, videotape or visual reproduction or depiction by computer in which child pornography is depicted is a Class X felony for which the defendant shall be sentenced to a term of imprisonment of not less than 9 years and not more than 40 years.
Title
CRIM CD-CHILD PORNOGRAPHY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-23 | Assigned to Computer Technology Committee | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Biggins | |
2009-02-20 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Biggins | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2009-02-19 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Biggins | |
2009-02-19 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. | |
2009-02-19 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-13 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1315&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB1315.htm |