IL HB1282 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act. Provides that, beginning January 1, 2025, no person or entity shall manufacture, sell, deliver, hold, or offer for sale in commerce any cosmetic product that contains specified intentionally added ingredients. Provides an exception to the prohibition. Contains other provisions.
Title
COSMETIC PRODUCT SAFETY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1282&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1282.htm |