IL HB1272 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on August 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0401
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on August 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0401
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that when a person is released prior to conviction (by bail payment or recognizance) and submits his or her FOID card to the clerk of the circuit court, the circuit court clerk shall mail the confiscated card to the Illinois State Police.
Title
CRIM PRO- FOID TO STATE POLICE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0401 |
2011-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-20 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-000-000 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2011 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 14, 2011 |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2011-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-03-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2011-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 006-000-000 |
2011-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2011-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2011-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2011-02-23 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2011-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2011-02-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karen May |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 110-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |