IL HB1271 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on July 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on July 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that any licensed health care worker, who has been (1) convicted of committing a sexual criminal act that requires registration under the Sex Offender Registration Act against a patient in the course of patient care or treatment, (2) has been convicted of a criminal battery against any patient, (3) a forcible felony, or (4) required as part of a criminal sentence to register under the Sex Offender Registration Act, then the license of the health care worker shall by operation of law be permanently revoked without a hearing. Provides that no person registered as a sex offender may receive a license as a health care worker in Illinois. Requires that within 15 business days after receiving notice from the State's Attorney of the filing of criminal charges against the health care worker, the Secretary shall issue an administrative order that the health care worker may only practice with a chaperone during all patient encounters pending the outcome of the criminal proceedings. Adds provisions concerning the confidentiality of certain information and documents. Effective immediately.
Title
HEALTH CARE WORKER-SEX CRIME
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-21 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0156 |
2011-07-21 | House | Effective Date August 20, 2011 |
2011-07-21 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-18 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2011 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2011-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2011-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2011-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2011-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2011-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 006-000-000 |
2011-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William D. Burns |
2011-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2011-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William D. Burns |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 006-000-000 |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack McGuire |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May |
2011-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William D. Burns |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2011-02-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William D. Burns |