IL HB1208 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Court of Claims Act. Provides that for the purpose of making up any deficiency in the appropriation for the payment of claims directed pursuant to the Line of Duty Compensation Act, there is appropriated, on a continuing annual basis in each fiscal year, from the General Revenue Fund to the Court of Claims, the amount, if any, by which the total appropriation for the payment of claims directed pursuant to the Line of Duty Compensation Act for the fiscal year is less than the amount required for the payment of claims pursuant to the Line of Duty Compensation Act for that fiscal year. Provides that the amount of any continuing appropriation used by the Court of Claims under the amendatory Act for a given fiscal year shall be charged against the unexpended amount of any appropriation for line of duty awards to the Court of Claims for that fiscal year that subsequently becomes available. Requires the Court of Claims to report to the President and Minority Leader of the Senate, the Speaker and Minority Leader of the House of Representatives, and the Governor's Office of Management and Budget any continuing appropriation that is used at the conclusion of a fiscal year. Effective immediately.
Title
CLAIMS CT-LINE OF DUTY AWARDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2023-12-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2023-05-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2023-05-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2023-05-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Egofske |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2023-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2023-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr. |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2023-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
2023-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2023-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2023-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2023-02-15 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 505 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |