IL HB1197 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Solicitation for Charity Act. Defines "reviewed financial statements". Provides that every charitable organization that receives in any 12-month period ending upon its established fiscal or calendar year contributions in excess of $500,000 (rather than $300,000) shall file a written report meeting specified criteria with the Attorney General. Provides that a charitable organization that receives in excess of $300,000, but not in excess of $500,000, shall file a written report meeting other specified criteria with the Attorney General upon forms prescribed by the Attorney General. Provides that the Attorney General, within a binding nonjudicial settlement agreement, may accept a written assurance of discontinuance of any method, act, or practice alleged to be a violation of the reporting requirements from the person who has engaged in the method, act, or practice. Provides that the changes made by the amendatory Act are inoperative on and after January 1, 2029. Effective January 1, 2024.
Title
CHARITY ORG-SOLICIT REPORT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2023-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-02-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2023-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2023-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2023-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2023-02-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2023-02-15 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-01-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2023-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 460 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 460 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |