IL HB1185 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date for Section 2.5 of the Illinois Plumbing License Law to January 1, 2023 from January 1, 2013. Effective immediately.
Title
IRRIGATION CONTRACTOR-SUNSET
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-09-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-14 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 80 | 4.23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1185&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB1185.htm |