IL HB1159 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Permits certain judicial officers, the Attorney General, assistant Attorneys General, State's Attorneys and assistant State's Attorneys, some with specified written consent, to carry a concealed firearm in any building, parking area, or portion of a building under the control of an officer of the executive or legislative branch of government, any building designated for matters before a circuit court, appellate court, or the Supreme Court, or any building or portion of a building under the control of the Supreme Court and any building or portion of a building under the control of a unit of local government.
Title
FIREARMS-JUDICIAL&PROSECUTORS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2024-02-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-02-29 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. |
2023-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 66 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |