IL HB1052 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nurse Practice Act. Removes references to a written collaborative agreement throughout the Act. Provides that an advanced practice nurse's scope of practice includes collaboration and consultation with or referral to a physician or other appropriate health-care professional for patient care needs that exceed the APN's scope of practice, education, or experience. Provides that as part of the professional scope of advanced practice nursing, an advanced practice nurse possesses prescriptive authority appropriate to his or her specialty, scope of practice, education, and experience. Such prescriptive authority shall include the authority to prescribe, select, order, administer, store, accept samples of, and dispense over-the-counter medications, legend drugs, medical gases, certain controlled substances, and other preparations, including botanical and herbal remedies. Amends various other Acts to make related changes. Effective immediately.
Title
NURSE-COLLABORATION-PRESCRIBE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0192 |
2013-08-06 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-09 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2013-04-11 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |