IL HB1042 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1002
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1002
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Department of Central Management Services.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-21 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1002 |
2018-08-21 | House | Effective Date August 21, 2018 |
2018-08-21 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 108-001-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hutchinson |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 006-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-001-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-03-06 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-02-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-26 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 405 | 405-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |