IL HB0982 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-12-10 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Open Meetings Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-10HouseSent to the Governor
2018-11-28HousePassed Both Houses
2018-11-28SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-11-28Senate3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 28, 2018
2018-11-27SenateSecond Reading
2018-11-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-11-27SenateDo Pass Executive; 013-000-000
2018-11-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-11-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-11-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-11-15SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-11-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-11-15SenateArrive in Senate
2018-11-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-11-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-000-000
2018-11-15House3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-11-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-11-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2018-11-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-11-09HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-11-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-07HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51201.02Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback