IL HB0982 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-15 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-15 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Open Meetings Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning definitions.
Title
GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-11-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-15 | House | Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken |
2019-01-11 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2018-12-10 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-11-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 28, 2018 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 013-000-000 |
2018-11-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-11-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-000-000 |
2018-11-15 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-11-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-11-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2018-11-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-11-09 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-11-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-07 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 120 | 1.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |