IL HB0933 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code, Illinois Local Library Act, Public Library District Act of 1991, and the Village Library Act. Provides that local libraries may not possess securities or financial assets in a fiscal year in excess of 200% of the total revenue (during the preceding fiscal year) of the local library. Provides that if a local library possesses securities or financial assets in excess of 200% of the total revenue, then it must reduce its property tax levy to ensure that the securities or financial assets plus revenue does not exceed 200% of the total revenue. Requires a voter referendum approving any capital improvement project that at least 50% of the projected cost of the project is to be paid for by the local library's securities or financial assets and it imposes additional operating costs on the local library. Requires a local library to disclose on its website its securities and financial assets when the local library's securities and financial assets are in excess of 50% of the total revenue of the local library. Defines terms. Amends the State Library Act. Requires the State Librarian to adopt rules governing when and how local libraries disclose the local library's securities and financial assets on their website.
Title
LIBRARIES-SECURITIES & ASSETS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 320 | 8.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-38012.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 16 | 1-60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 40 | 4.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 5 | 1-8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=933&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0933.htm |