IL HB0909 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0236
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children's Advocacy Center Act. Provides that consent is not required for a forensic interview to be electronically recorded and that failure to record does not render a forensic interview inadmissible. Provides that a forensic interview, an electronic recording, or a transcription of an interview or electronic recording is confidential and exempt from public inspection and copying and may only be viewed by a court, attorneys, investigators, or experts for the purpose of judicial and administrative hearings and shall not be disseminated except pursuant to a court's protective order. Provides that nothing in the Act shall be construed to limit or prohibit electronically recorded forensic interviewing in accordance with provisions concerning surveillance and investigations in the Criminal Code of 2012 and Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Adds a definition and modifies a definition. Amends the Freedom of Information Act making conforming changes. Effective January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHILDREN'S ADVOCACY-INTERVIEW

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0236
2019-08-09HouseEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-09HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-24HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-03-27SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-20SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-20SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-03-20SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-03-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2019-03-07HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-06HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2019-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2019-02-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-02-20HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-02-19HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 013-000-000
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text
55802.5Amended CodeCitation Text
55804.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback