IL HB0900 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0235
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0235
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Repeals a provision making committed persons responsible to reimburse the Department of Corrections for the expenses incurred by their incarceration at a rate to be determined by the Department. Amends the Code of Civil Procedure to make conforming changes.
Title
INCARCERATION-REIMBURSE-REPEAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0235 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 033-018-000 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 006-003-001 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-043-000 |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-26 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-02-19 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2019-02-19 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-02-19 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-006-000 |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-12-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-12-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-7-6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 4-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |