IL HB0864 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Creates an assessment freeze homestead exemption for persons with a disability. Sets forth the amount of the exemption. Provides that applicants must reapply on an annual basis. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-DISABILITY-FREEZE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=864&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0864.htm |