IL HB0863 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Vegetative Buffer Act. Provides that all State property adjacent to a body of water must contain a vegetative buffer that at a minimum meets a 30-foot minimum width. Exempts State land if certain conditions are present. Defines "vegetative buffer". Effective January 1, 2022.
Title
VEGETATIVE BUFFERS-STATE LAND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=863&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0863.htm |