IL HB0833 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0453
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0453
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, in a county with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants, for taxable years 2020 through 2024, a taxpayer who has been granted a senior citizens homestead exemption need not reapply (currently, the taxpayer must reapply annually). Provides that, if the property ceases to be qualified for that exemption in any year for which a reapplication is not required, then the owner of record of the property shall notify the chief county assessment officer that the property is no longer qualified. Provides that the chief county assessment officer shall enter into intergovernmental agreements with the county clerk of his or her county and the Department of Public Health, as well as any other appropriate governmental agency, to obtain information that documents the death of a taxpayer who has been granted a senior citizens homestead exemption. Makes conforming changes in provisions concerning erroneous homestead exemptions. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SENIOR HOMESTEAD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0453 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2019-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-05-22 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-20 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-02-14 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |