IL HB0810 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Property Control Act. Provides that the Director of Central Management Services as Administrator may convey any surplus real property covered by the State Property Control Act, by sale or lease, to a duly incorporated, charitable, non-profit organization or association for the cultivation and sale of fresh fruits and vegetables on a tract of land of less than 5 acres within any local governmental unit, provided that the non-profit organization or association is not controlled, directly or indirectly, by any agricultural, commercial, or other business. Provides that the non-profit organization or association shall be authorized to sell fresh fruits and vegetables either on the land that was conveyed, off that land, or both, provided, that the sales are related or incidental to the non-profit purposes of the organization or association, and the net proceeds received by the non-profit organization or association are used to further the non-profit purposes of the organization or association. Provides that the lease of any real property to any duly incorporated non-profit organization or association shall be in accordance with the Illinois Procurement Code. Amends the Property Tax Code to provide a property tax exemption for non-profit organizations using land for the cultivation and sale of fresh fruits and vegetables.
Title
STATE PROPERTY-URBAN FARMS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 605 | 7.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=810&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0810.htm |