IL HB0795 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Provides that, in a case involving dissolution of marriage, declaration of invalidity of marriage, allocation of parental responsibilities, or domestic violence, the court shall only appoint a guardian ad litem if the guardian ad litem has completed 20 hours of classroom training and 20 hours of training by a domestic abuse advocate to become a guardian ad litem. Provides that the training to become a guardian ad litem shall be offered by a statewide organization advocating for survivors of domestic violence. Provides that the new requirements do not apply to a unit of State or local government providing services, or a public defender's office associated with a unit of State or local government.
Title
IMDMA-GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | To Family Law & Probate Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
750 | 5 | 506 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=795&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0795.htm |