IL HB0755 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits grooming when he or she knowingly in person or by use of a computer on-line service, Internet service, local bulletin board service, or any other device capable of electronic data storage or transmission, seduces, solicits, lures, or entices, or attempts to seduce, solicit, lure, or entice, a child, a child's guardian, or another person believed by the person to be a child or a child's guardian, to commit any sex offense as defined in Section 2 of the Sex Offender Registration Act, to distribute photographs depicting the sex organs of the child, or to otherwise engage in any unlawful sexual conduct with a child or with another person believed by the person to be a child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-GROOMING-IN PERSON

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-20SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-20SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-04-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-04-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-04-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-04-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-05HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2017-03-30HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Criminal Committee;
2017-03-30HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 005-000-000
2017-02-16HouseTo Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720511-25Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback