IL HB0731 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Local Government Taxpayers' Bill of Rights Act. Provides that, for utility taxes, no notice of determination of tax due or assessment may be issued more than 7 years (currently, 4 years) after the end of the calendar year for which the return for the period was filed or the end of the calendar year in which the return for the period was due, whichever occurs later. Provides that a municipality may annually (currently, every 2 years) request certain information from a utility that the municipality reasonably requires in order to perform an audit. Provides that the utility may provide certain premises-specific information to the municipality but may not provide customer-specific information. Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission shall not consider (i) certain court costs, attorney's fees, penalties, or interest to be an expense of any public utility company when determining a rate or charge. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION MANAGER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-18HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-06-16HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-007-000
2021-06-16HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-007-000
2021-06-15HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-06-15HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-06-14HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2021-06-14HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2021-06-14HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2021-06-14HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2021-06-14HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2021-06-01HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2021-06-01HouseArrived in House
2021-06-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2021-06-01Senate3/5 Vote Required
2021-06-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2021-06-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Murphy
2021-06-01SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2021-06-01SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-06-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2021-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2021-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2021
2021-05-27SenateSecond Reading
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2021-05-27SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 009-005-000
2021-05-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-05-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2021-05-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-05-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2021-05-21SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021
2021-05-11SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2021-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2021-04-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2021-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-04-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2021-04-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000
2021-04-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2021-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2021-04-12HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-12HouseRemoved from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2021-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-03-24HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Labor & Commerce Committee; 025-000-000
2021-03-02HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2021-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22542710Amended CodeCitation Text
225427115Amended CodeCitation Text
22542712New CodeSee Bill Text
225427120Amended CodeCitation Text
225427135Repealed CodeCitation Text
225427140Amended CodeCitation Text
225427145Amended CodeCitation Text
22542715Amended CodeCitation Text
225427155Amended CodeCitation Text
225427161New CodeSee Bill Text
225427162New CodeSee Bill Text
225427165Amended CodeCitation Text
225427170Repealed CodeCitation Text
22542720Amended CodeCitation Text
22542725Amended CodeCitation Text
22542727Amended CodeCitation Text
22542730Amended CodeCitation Text
22542740Amended CodeCitation Text
22542741New CodeSee Bill Text
22542742Repealed CodeCitation Text
22542745Amended CodeCitation Text
22542750Amended CodeCitation Text
22542755Amended CodeCitation Text
22542760Amended CodeCitation Text
22542765Amended CodeCitation Text
22542770Amended CodeCitation Text
22542775Amended CodeCitation Text
22542780Repealed CodeCitation Text
22542785Amended CodeCitation Text
22542785.1New CodeSee Bill Text
22542786New CodeSee Bill Text
22542790Amended CodeCitation Text
22542792Amended CodeCitation Text
22542795Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.32Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.41New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback