IL HB0715 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code and the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the corporate authorities of a county or municipality may license or regulate businesses operating as a public accommodation that permit the consumption of cannabis on the business premises and that are not regulated under the Cannabis Regulation and Tax Act. Provides an exemption from a provision of the Cannabis Regulation and Tax Act. Defines "public accommodation". Effective immediately.
Title
BRING YOUR OWN CANNABIS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 1126.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-42-10.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=715&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0715.htm |