IL HB0715 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-14 - Motion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 069-045-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-14 - Motion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 069-045-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Home Rule County Retailers' Occupation Tax Law of the Counties Code and the Home Rule County Service Occupation Tax Law of the Counties Code. Provides that the maximum tax rate that is permitted under those Laws is 0.75%, unless a higher rate is authorized by referendum. Preempts home rule powers. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL GOV-HOME RULE TAXES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-10-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 69 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-14 | Motion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 069-045-000 | |
2009-10-14 | Shall the Chair be Sustained | |
2009-10-14 | Appeal Ruling of Chair Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-10-14 | Chair Rules Motion Out of Order | |
2009-10-14 | Moved to Suspend Rule 65(a) Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-03-26 | Third Reading - Extended Debate - Lost 061-055-000 | |
2009-03-26 | 3/5 Vote Required | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Extended Debate | |
2009-03-26 | Removed from Short Debate Status | |
2009-03-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr. | |
2009-03-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Bassi | |
2009-03-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin | |
2009-03-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2009-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-25 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-03-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker | |
2009-03-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe | |
2009-03-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-19 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 006-005-000 | |
2009-03-11 | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) March 19, 2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Re-assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-05 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |